Birman, Harry (CPSO#: 50159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yiddish

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 312
Scarborough ON  M1S 4V5
Phone: (416) 298-2922
Fax: (416) 298-8877
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Harry Birman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Birman ( CPSO# 50159 )

Business Address:
Suite 312
4040 Finch Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1S 4V5
Phone Number: (416) 298-2922

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 28 Jan 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HARRY BIRMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1985