Bishop, Clare Elizabeth (CPSO#: 30144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1978

Summary

Former Name: Vaughan, Clare Elizabeth (used until: 22 Mar 1983 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

595 Montreal Road
Suite 202
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Canada
Phone: (613) 746-6745
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jean Pierre Lafleche Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 14 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Lafleche ( CPSO# 32987 )
Dr. C. Bishop ( CPSO# 30144 )

Business Address:
202 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 746-6745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE ELIZABETH BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978