Bishop, Susan Leslie (CPSO#: 62675)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone: (416) 928-3254
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S.L. Bishop Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bishop ( CPSO# 62675 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
720 Spadina Avenue
Toronto ON  M5S 2T9
Phone Number: (416) 928-3254

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN LESLIE BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 1992