Bisleri, Gianluigi (CPSO#: 110967)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Oct 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2019

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Oct 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:Universita Degli Studi de Brescia, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 548-3232
Electoral District: 06

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Italy

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Gianluigi Bisleri may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Surgery,
                        Division  of  Cardiac  Surgery,  Queen's  University,  in which Dr.
                        Bisleri  holds  an  academic  appointment  at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Bisleri no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.

            Note: This certificate is issued on October 1, 2016, and  expires  on  June 30,
                  2019.  Upon  renewal  of  Dr.  Bisleri's  academic appointment at Queen's
                  University, the expiry date can be extended,  subject  tot he limitations
                  in paragraph 2 above.