Bismonte, Maria Dulce Buenafe (CPSO#: 63057)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: Bismonte, Maria Dulce (used until: 25 May 1992 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino, Tagalog

Education:University of Santo Tomas, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
1525 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 5G5
Phone: (416) 236-9728
Fax: (416) 744-8106
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maria Dulce Bismonte Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bismonte ( CPSO# 63057 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
1525 Albion Road
Toronto ON  M9V 5G5
Phone Number: (416) 236-9728

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIA DULCE BUENAFE BISMONTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISMONTE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Nov 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Dec 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1996