Bissada, Hany Edgard (CPSO#: 50161)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Dec 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Cairo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
4th Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8042
Fax: (613) 737-8085
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1929 Russell road, unit 310
Ottawa, Ontario
K1G 4G3
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-6649
Fax: (613) 737-6569
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hany Bissada Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Bissada ( CPSO# 50161 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
4th Floor
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8042

Business Address:
1929 Russel Road
Suite 310
Ottawa ON  K1G 4G3
Phone Number: (613) 614-4878

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group,Brockville Mental Health Centre Brockville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HANY EDGARD BISSADA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISSADA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1983