Bjarnason, Georg Arnold (CPSO#: 53164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Icelandic

Education:University of Iceland, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5847
Fax: (416) 480-6002
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G.A. Bjarnason Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bjarnason ( CPSO# 53164 )

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room T2-049
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5847

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORG ARNOLD BJARNASON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BJARNASON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Jun 1991