Black, Robert Thomas (CPSO#: 60888)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone: (519) 631-0567
Fax: (519) 631-0921
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert T. Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Black ( CPSO# 60888 )

Business Address:
236 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 1J5
Phone Number: (519) 631-0567

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital St Thomas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT THOMAS BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1990