Black, Stephanie Alicia (CPSO#: 93223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
E2-620B
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8355
Fax: 519-685-8573
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephanie Black Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Black ( CPSO# 93223 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Hospital
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B-401
London ON  N6A 5W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 31 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE ALICIA BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 14 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2011 to 14 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 14 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 2015