Blacklock, Elaine Gloria (CPSO#: 52886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Mar 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Mar 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
NeoKids Building
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7120 Ext. 6
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Elaine Blacklock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Blacklock ( CPSO# 52886 )

Business Address:
NeoKids Building
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 13 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELAINE GLORIA BLACKLOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACKLOCK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Mar 1994