Blaine, Sean Martin (CPSO#: 63870)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
700 O'Loane Avenue
Stratford ON  N5A 6S6
Phone: (519) 273-1060
Fax: (519) 273-0371
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sean Blaine Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Blaine ( CPSO# 63870 )

Business Address:
700 O'Loane Avenue
Stratford ON  N5A 6S6
Phone Number: (519) 273-1060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1994 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN MARTIN BLAINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLAINE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1992