Blank, Diana Sabina (CPSO#: 84996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3492 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2N6
Phone: 647-352-8003
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Diana Blank Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Blank ( CPSO# 84996 )

Business Address:
3492 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 2N6
Phone Number: (647) 352-8003

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA SABINA BLANK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLANK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011