Blewett, Christopher James (CPSO#: 67464)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Sep 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone: (905) 641-0700
Fax: (905) 641-0074
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chris Blewett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blewett ( CPSO# 67464 )

Business Address:
204 - 145 Queenston Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 641-0700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER JAMES BLEWETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLEWETT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1993