Blokker, Catherine Pauline (CPSO#: 53933)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine Blokker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Blokker ( CPSO# 53933 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE PAULINE BLOKKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOKKER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1984 to 14 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 01 Feb 1990
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1989