Blom, Christine Rita (CPSO#: 79215)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Mar 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Mar 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone: (705) 549-3939
Fax: (705) 549-0029
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1112 St Andrew's Drive
P O Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Georgian Bay General Hospital
1212 st andrews drive
midland
Po Box 760
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Canada
Phone: (705) 526-1300
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Badenhorst and Blom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Badenhorst ( CPSO# 79216 )
Dr. C. Blom ( CPSO# 79215 )

Business Address:
Bayside Medical Centre
3 Beck Boulevard
Penetanguishene ON  L9M 1B9
Phone Number: (705) 549-3939

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE RITA BLOM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLOM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2005