Blom, Phillip Patrick (CPSO#: 80537)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Pretoria, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Phillip Blom Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 9 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Mar 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013