Blumenfeld, Renee (CPSO#: 61112)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone: (905) 881-6667
Fax: (905) 731-1298
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Renee Blumenfeld Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Blumenfeld ( CPSO# 61112 )

Business Address:
Suite 206
2900 Steeles Avenue East
Thornhill ON  L3T 4X1
Phone Number: (905) 881-6667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RENEE BLUMENFELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLUMENFELD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jul 1990