Boag, Alexander Harvey (CPSO#: 59570)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Department of Pathology
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 4190
Fax: (613) 548-6076
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexander Boag Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boag ( CPSO# 59570 )

Business Address:
Queen's University
Department of Pathology
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (613) 533-2850

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXANDER HARVEY BOAG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOAG is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - General Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1989