Bock, Graeme Benjamin (CPSO#: 103945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin ON  N0H 2C3
Phone: (519) 832-9600
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Saugeen Memorial Hospital
340 High St
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Canada
Phone: 519-797-3230
Fax: 905-945-7707
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Graeme Bock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bock ( CPSO# 103945)

Business Address:
320 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0

Business Address:
786 Goderich Street
Port Elgin ON  N0H 2C3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jan 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GRAEME BENJAMIN BOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 09 Jan 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2017