Bocknek, Amber Lilly (CPSO#: 70007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: Brown, Amber Lilly (used until: 30 Aug 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 245
12-16715 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3X 1X4
Phone: (905) 251-9998
Fax: (905) 235-0769
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amber Bocknek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 26 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bocknek ( CPSO# 70007 )

Business Address:
Suite 245
12-16715 Yonge Street
Newmarket ON  L3X 1X4
Phone Number: (905) 251-9998

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMBER LILLY BOCKNEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOCKNEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1998