Boet, Sylvain (CPSO#: 88292)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2011

Expiry Date:  31 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Universite De Rouen, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8187
Fax: 613-737-8189
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sylvain Boet Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Boet ( CPSO# 88292 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Anaesthesia
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 May 2008 to 11 Jul 2008
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 12 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Aug 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Apr 2014 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Sylvain Boet may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
                        Anaesthesia, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. Boet holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Boet no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Boet's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Boet's certificate of
                        registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report.


            Note: This certificate is issued on September 1, 2011 and will expire on or
                  before August 31, 2018 in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.