Boettcher, Allen David (CPSO#: 30949)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Feb 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Iroquois Falls Family Health Team
58A Anson Dr
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone: 705-258-2818
Fax: 705-258-2828
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Allen Boettcher Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boettcher ( CPSO# 30949 )

Business Address:
Iroquois Falls Family Health Team
58A Anson Drive
Iroquois Falls ON  P0K 1E0
Phone Number: (705) 258-2818

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALLEN DAVID BOETTCHER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOETTCHER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Apr 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 14 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2010