Boggild, Andrea Kristine (CPSO#: 79483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tropical Disease Unit
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
13th Floor, North Wing, Rm 1350
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3675
Fax: (416) 340-3260
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrea Boggild Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Boggild ( CPSO# 79483 )

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
Tropical Disease Unit
1350 - 200 Elizabeth Street
13th Floor, North Wing
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3675

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 13 Sep 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANDREA KRISTINE BOGGILD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGGILD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008