Bogoch, Isaac Israel (CPSO#: 83148)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: Bogoch, Isaac (used until: 27 Jun 2005 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Divisions of Internal Medicine and
Infectious Diseases
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4800
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Isaac Bogoch Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bogoch ( CPSO# 83148 )

Business Address:
UNH Toronto General Hospital
Divisions of Internal Medicine and Infectious Dise
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-4800

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-2581

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISAAC ISRAEL BOGOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOGOCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009