Bohnen, John Marc Aaron (CPSO#: 53085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
402-55 Queen St E
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6
Phone: (416) 864-3047
Fax: (416) 864-5163
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Bohnen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 16 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bohnen ( CPSO# 53085 )

Business Address:
Suite 402
55 Queen Street East
Toronto ON  M5C 1R6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN MARC AARON BOHNEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOHNEN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983