Bonin, Brigitte (CPSO#: 67239)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 May 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Montreal, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room 8476
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8968
Fax: (613) 737-8070
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brigitte Bonin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bonin ( CPSO# 67239 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room 8476
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8968

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIGITTE BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 6 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1995