Bonin, Pierre Leon (CPSO#: 68982)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 102
1276 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone: (705) 521-0753
Fax: (705) 521-1766
Electoral District: 08
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Rd
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 522-2200
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Villa St.Gabriel's Nursing Home
4690 Regional Rd 15
Chelmsford, Ontario
Sudbury ON  P0M 1L0
Canada
Phone: (705) 590-2580
Fax: (705) 590-3090
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pierre Bonin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Bonin ( CPSO# 68982 )

Business Address:
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1

Business Address:
Villa St. Gabriel
4690 Regional Road 15
Chelmsford ON  P0M 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 590-2580

Business Address:
102 - 1276 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 1Y8
Phone Number: (705) 521-0753

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PIERRE LEON BONIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1997