Bookman, Ian David (CPSO#: 75007)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:University of Toronto, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 226-2777
Fax: (416) 226-2771
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Cancer Screening Centre
340 College Street, Suite 601
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
Fax: (416) 928-9513
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 11 2009


Corporation Name: Dr. Bookman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 09 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Bookman ( CPSO# 75007 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 226-2777

Business Address:
601 - 340 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 928-9511

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 26 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN DAVID BOOKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOOKMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004