Borenstein, Harold Bernard (CPSO#: 56729)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2100 Finch Avenue West
Suite 106
North York ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone: (416) 739-7558
Fax: (416) 739-7601
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Harold Borenstein Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Borenstein ( CPSO# 56729 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
200 Church Street
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 658-2241

Business Address:
Suite 106
2100 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2Z9
Phone Number: (416) 739-7558

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAROLD BERNARD BORENSTEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORENSTEIN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Nephrology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1987