Borrie, Michael John (CPSO#: 50182)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Otago, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Parkwood Institute
Main Building
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone: (519) 685-4021
Fax: (519) 685-4093
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael J. Borrie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Borrie ( CPSO# 50182 )

Business Address:
Suite A2-129
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-4021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOHN BORRIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORRIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1981
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1985