Borts, David (CPSO#: 50183)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Feb 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 205
10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone: (905) 497-7747
Fax: (905) 497-7748
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Borts Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Borts ( CPSO# 50183 )

Business Address:
205 - 10 Cottrelle Boulevard
Brampton ON  L6S 0E2
Phone Number: (905) 497-7747

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID BORTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BORTS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Feb 1983