Botrous, Merritte Melad Saddeek (CPSO#: 84865)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Moy Medical Centre
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON  N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 946-0443
Fax: (519) 946-0553
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1480 Erie road south
Harrow ON  N0R1G0
Canada
Phone: 519-738-2000
Fax: 519-738-9944
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Ohio

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MERRITTE MELAD SADDEEK BOTROUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOTROUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2008