Bouchard-Fortier, Genevieve Maude Louise (CPSO#: 89042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 university avenue
OPG Wing 6th Floor
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 5061
Fax: 416-946-2288
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Bouchard-Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 26 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Bouchard-Fortier ( CPSO# 89042 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
OPG Wing 6th Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective: 27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE MAUDE LOUISE BOUCHARD-FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOUCHARD-FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 12 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013