Boules, Isaac Faris (CPSO#: 79815)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cairo, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 418
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone: (905) 629-1006
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1995A Weston Road
Toronto ON  M9N 1X2
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-2216
Fax: (416) 242-9751
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Boules Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Boules ( CPSO# 79815 )

Business Address:
418 - 1420 Burnhamthorpe Road
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 629-1006

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Nov 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ISAAC FARIS BOULES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 13 Feb 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006