Boulton, Melfort Richard (CPSO#: 77906)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Room C7 124
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3602
Fax: (519) 663-3601
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melfort Boulton Medicine, Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Boulton ( CPSO# 77906 )

Business Address:
LHSC University Hospital
Room C7 124
339 Windemere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3602

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELFORT RICHARD BOULTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOULTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008