Bowler, William Blake (CPSO#: 50188)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 03 May 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5- 1080 Adelaide Street North
London ON  N5Y 2N1
Phone: (226) 663-6605
Fax: (519) 488-0751
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. W. B. Bowler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 20 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 May 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 03 May 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Quality Assurance Committee Effective: 03 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m., May 3, 2017, by order of the Quality Assurance Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. William Blake Bowler:

            Cease to Practice Pending Completion of Dictation Backlog

            (i)   Dr. Bowler shall cease to practice medicine until he has completed the
                  backlog in his dictation of patient charts and the College is satisfied
                  that the backlog has been completed. 

            (ii)  Dr. Bowler may return to practice when he receives written notice from
                  the College indicating that he may return to practice.

            Clinical Supervision

            (iii) Upon his return to practice, Dr. Bowler shall engage in focused
                  educational sessions with the clinical supervisor who has signed a
                  Clinical Supervision Undertaking to the College ("Clinical Supervisor")
                  for a period of no less than ten (10) months. The Clinical Supervisor
                  shall meet with Dr. Bowler in person monthly and shall review, at each
                  meeting, a minimum of thirty (30) patient charts to ensure that all
                  dictations are being completed on a daily basis. In addition, from the
                  thirty (30) patient charts selected by the Clinical Supervisor, fifteen
                  (15) patient charts will be assessed for the standard of practice with
                  respect to documentation and care as outlined in the Clinical
                  Supervisor's Undertaking attached as Schedule "A and the Individualized
                  Education Plan ("IEP") attached as Schedule "B". 

            (iv)  The Clinical Supervisor shall submit a report to the College every other
                  month and will keep a log of all patient charts reviewed along with
                  patient identifiers.  

            Medical record Keeping Course

            (v)   Prior to September 3, 2018, Dr. Bowler shall successfully complete a
                  course in medical record keeping through a course provider approved by
                  the College.

            Reassessment

            (vi)  Approximately three (3) months following the completion of the ten (10)
                  months of focused educations sessions with the Clinical Supervisor, Dr.
                  Bowler shall undergo a reassessment of his practice by an assessor
                  selected by the College ("Assessor").  The reassessment will focus on the
                  deficiencies identified in the previous assessments, and may include:
                  reviewing a minimum of twenty-five (25) patient charts; an interview with
                  Dr. Bowler; and direct observation of his practice.  The Assessor shall
                  submit a written report to the College regarding Dr. Bowler's standard of
                  practice with respect to documentation and care, and this report will be
                  provided to the Quality Assurance Committee and may form the basis of
                  further action by the College.


Concerns

Source: QA Committee
Active Date: August 17, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

Where the Quality Assurance Committee has made a decision on or after June 1, 2016 in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”), the College By-laws require that the elements of the SCERP be posted on the register. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the Quality Assurance Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)