Boyd, Cameron Lindsay (CPSO#: 33171)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cameron Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 707 Charlotte Street Peterborough ON K9J 7B3
Date Received: 23 Dec 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2016