Boyd, Hugh Flexman (CPSO#: 89284)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
56 Governor's Road
Dundas ON  L9H5G7
Phone: 9056273541 Ext. 2218
Fax: 905628-0825
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

329 Parkside Drive
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Canada
Phone: (905) 689-2662
Fax: (905) 689-2625
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Hugh Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Boyd ( CPSO# 89284 )

Business Address:
250 Dundas Street East
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H4
Phone Number: (289) 895-7862

Business Address:
56 Governor's Road
Dundas ON  L9H 5G7
Phone Number: (905) 627-3541

Business Address:
329 Parkside Drive
Waterdown ON  L0R 2H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-2662

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH FLEXMAN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2010