Boyd, John Gordon (CPSO#: 84773)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Critical Care Program
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 6228
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Gordon Boyd Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boyd ( CPSO# 84773 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Critical Care Program
Davies 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN GORDON BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011