Boyd, Kerry Ellen (CPSO#: 59507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: Thurlow, Kerry Ellen (used until: 09 Jan 1994 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3280 Schmon Parkway
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 684-6918 Ext. 250
Fax: (905) 684-5866
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MCH, Hamilton Health Sciences
Ron Joyce Children's Health Centre
325 Wellington St North
Hamilton ON  L8L 0A4
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 74275
Fax: (905) 387-7714
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KERRY ELLEN BOYD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1988 to 14 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1992