Boyes, Jeffrey Douglas (CPSO#: 79959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Strickland St. Unit 1
Lakefield ON  K0L 2H0
Phone: (705) 652-6405
Fax: (705) 652-6406
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey D. Boyes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Boyes ( CPSO# 79959 )

Business Address:
150 Strickland Street
Douro-Dummer ON  K0L 2H0
Phone Number: (705) 652-6405

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DOUGLAS BOYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2005