Boyle, Loree Lynn (CPSO#: 82559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
P.O Box 209
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 76739
Fax: (613) 739-6833
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: L. Boyle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Boyle ( CPSO# 82559 )

Business Address:
Division of General Medicine
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road CPCR 2134
PO Box 209
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LOREE LYNN BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009