Boynton, Erin Lynn (CPSO#: 55867)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medcentra
Suite 208
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 722-8193
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

280 Britania Rd East
Toronto ON  L4Z1S6
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Erin Boynton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Boynton ( CPSO# 55867 )

Business Address:
280 Brittania Road East
Mississauga ON  L4Z 1S6
Phone Number: (905) 306-8484

Business Address:
208 - 1366 Yonge Street
PO Box 10426
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 923-4567

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN LYNN BOYNTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYNTON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Research Fellows - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Dec 1991
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1986