Brabant, Angele Yvette (CPSO#: 80830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Outpatient Centre
Health Sciences North
865 Regent St. South, 2nd Floor
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-7381
Fax: (705) 671-7382
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Angele Brabant Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Brabant ( CPSO# 80830 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Outpatient Centre
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
2nd Floor
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 671-7381

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANGELE YVETTE BRABANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRABANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008