Brackstone, Muriel (CPSO#: 73714)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Room A3 - 931
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8712
Fax: (519) 685-8744
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Health Sciences Centre
265 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
Phone: (519) 646-6000
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brackstone Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Brackstone ( CPSO# 73714 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
790 Commissioners Road East
Room A3 - 931
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8712

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Sciences Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MURIEL BRACKSTONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRACKSTONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2004