Bradford, John Philip (CPSO#: 33201)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Apr 2004

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
301-720 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7R 4E2
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

18-1960 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JP Bradford Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bradford ( CPSO# 33201 )

Business Address:
720 Guelph Line
Suite 301
Burlington ON  L7R 4E2
Phone Number: (905) 631-9650

Business Address:
1960 Appleby Line
Suite 18
Burlington ON  L7L 0B7
Phone Number: (905) 319-2000

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 301, 720 Guelph Line, Burlington, ON L7R 4E2
Instructions: written requests for copies of medical recordsshould be forwarded to the address above
Date Received: 11 May 2015


Address: P O Box 62006 Burlington Mall ON L7R 3N0
Date Received: 08 May 2015

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 May 1982
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2004
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Aug 2004
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 17 Apr 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 17 Apr 2015 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 17, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. John Philip Bradford,
            in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bradford to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Bradford may not engage in the practice of surgery.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 25 May 2004
Summary:

 On May 25, 2004, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Bradford to have committed an act of 
 professional misconduct in that he committed an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional for conducting an operation without the patient(s 
 consent.

The Committee ordered the following:

1)	That Dr. Bradford be reprimanded, the fact of 
 the reprimand to be recorded on the 	register.
2)	That Dr. Bradford be suspended for one month 
 commencing on July 1, 2004, and;
3)	that Dr. Bradford pay costs to the College in the amount of 
 $2,500.00.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): May 25, 2004


Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Aug 2002
Summary:

 On August 26, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario 
 found that Dr. Bradford committed an act of professional misconduct under paragraph 1(1)33 of 
 Ontario Regulation 856/93 made under the Medicine Act, 1991, for an act or omission relevant to 
 the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be 
 regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline Committee 
 requires Dr. Bradford to attend before the panel to be reprimanded.

The Discipline Committee 
 directs the results of this proceeding be included in the register.

The Discipline Committee 
 directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Bradford(s certificate of registration for a period of one 
 month starting on the following date: October 1, 2003.

The Discipline Committee orders the 
 suspension of the one month suspension if Dr. Bradford takes at his own expense and successfully 
 completes the following courses approved by the College: (a) medical record-keeping; (b) 
 physician-patient communications; and (c) medical ethics and informed consent.  The courses must 
 be completed no later than the following date: September 30, 2003.

The Discipline Committee 
 requires Dr. Bradford to pay part of the College(s costs to the College, fixed in the amount of 
 $2,500.00 by the following date: November 30, 2002.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Aug 26, 2002