Braithwaite, Nicholas Dacre Jowitt (CPSO#: 32496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dalhousie University/IWK Health Cen
5850/5980 University Avenue
Halifax NS  B3K 6R8
Phone: 902-470-6905
Fax: 902-425-1125
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nicholas Braithwaite Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Braithwaite ( CPSO# 32496 )

Business Address:
Dalhousie University
IWK Health Centre
5850/5980 University Avenue
Halifax NS  B3K 6R8
Phone Number: (902) 470-6905

Medical Records Location

Address: William Osler Health System Health Records Department Tel: 905-494-2120 ext. 56203
Date Received: 12 Apr 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 03 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICHOLAS DACRE JOWITT BRAITHWAITE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRAITHWAITE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1980 to 16 Jun 1981
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2004