Branch, Charles Farrell (CPSO#: 96337)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Minnesota, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Aurora Family Health Clinic
971 Carrick Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6L9
Phone: (807) 285-1894
Fax: (807) 285-2098
Electoral District: 09
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TBay Regional Health Science Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6100
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES FARRELL BRANCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANCH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2013