Brandys, Timothy Michael (CPSO#: 62070)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4766
Fax: (613) 761-5362
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T.M. Brandys Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Brandys ( CPSO# 62070 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 761-4221

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - Riverside Campus
1967 Riverside
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4221

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Suite A280
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4766

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 05 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMOTHY MICHAEL BRANDYS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANDYS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 6 - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1990