Branigan, Monica Anne (CPSO#: 58664)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 7884
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Branigan & Tardif Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tardif ( CPSO# 52061 )
Dr. M. Branigan ( CPSO# 58664 )

Business Address:
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
550 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2A2
Phone Number: (416) 597-3422

Business Address:
Temmy Latner Centre for Palliative Care
60 Murray Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA ANNE BRANIGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BRANIGAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 1989